RI H7774 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes numerous technical amendments to the statutes on taxes and corporations, associations and partnerships.
Title
Rhode Island Business Corporation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7774.pdf |