RI H7773 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all electrical work performed in the state be done in accordance with the latest edition of the National Electric Code, and would also require that the state building commission adopt the latest edition of the National Electric Code.
Title
State Building Code - Administration And Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee heard |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2018-05-24 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/24/2018) |
2018-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |