RI H7768 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Honoring The Sandra Feinstein - Gamm Theatre And Wishing Them Well On Their Move To Jefferson Boulevard In Warwick, Rhode Island

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Honoring The Sandra Feinstein - Gamm Theatre And Wishing Them Well On Their Move To Jefferson Boulevard In Warwick, Rhode Island

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseHouse read and passed
2018-03-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/28/2018)
2018-03-22HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for consideration (03/22/2018)
2018-03-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback