RI H7765 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that a death certificate reflect the decedent’s gender identity, as reported by the next of kin.
Title
Vital Records
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-03-19 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/21/2018) |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |