RI H7763 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a procedure where a person who is determined to be an extreme risk to themselves or others will be required to surrender their firearm for a certain period.
Title
Extreme Risk Protection Orders -- Criminal Offenses--weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7763.pdf |