RI H7757 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the sealing of an application for a search warrant unless the court issuing the warrant issues an order granting relief from the seal.
Title
Search Warrants
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018) |
2018-04-10 | House | Meeting postponed (04/10/2018) |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7757.pdf |