RI H7756 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensively regulates the use of unmanned aerial vehicles and the use of any information that they may generate.
Title
Relating To Criminal Procedure
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018) |
2018-04-10 | House | Meeting postponed (04/10/2018) |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7756.pdf |