RI H7754 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of a stingray cell-site simulator device by any law enforcement agency except upon application for its use and the granting of its order by the presiding justice of the superior court.
Title
Pen Registers And Trap And Trace Devices
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018) |
2018-04-10 | House | Meeting postponed (04/10/2018) |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7754.pdf |