RI H7746 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the appoint the historian laureate from a five (5) year term to a three (3) year term, and requires the historian laureate to develop and implement programs about pertinent aspects of Rhode Island history.
Title
Historian Laureate Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] |
Rep. David Morales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7746.pdf |