RI H7737 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - House voted to recommit to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits adults with valid foreign driver's licenses to drive in Rhode Island in compliance with Geneva Convention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Operators' And Chauffeurs' Licenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23HouseHouse voted to recommit to House Judiciary
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-23HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-06-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for consideration (06/06/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018)
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback