RI H7733 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protects communications between language interpreters appointed under this chapter and limited-English-proficient persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts - Language Interpreters - Use Of Language Interpreters In Legal Proceedings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-27HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-23HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseCommittee transferred to House Judiciary
2018-04-23HouseMeeting postponed (04/25/2018)
2018-04-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-04-03HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (04/04/2018)
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-16HouseCommittee transferred to House H.E.W.
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback