RI H7733 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protects communications between language interpreters appointed under this chapter and limited-English-proficient persons.
Title
Courts - Language Interpreters - Use Of Language Interpreters In Legal Proceedings
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | House | Meeting postponed (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-04-03 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/04/2018) |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-03-16 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |