RI H7732 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the secretary of state and board of elections to conduct an extensive cybersecurity assessment of our election systems and facilities and to establish a cybersecurity review board.
Title
Secretary Of State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Internet, & Technology: Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Internet, & Technology: Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/09/2022) |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-04-07 | House | House read and passed |
2022-04-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/07/2022) |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/31/2022) |
2022-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee transferred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |