RI H7732 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits PFAS, a class of fluorinated organic chemicals, from being used in food packaging.
Title
Pfas In Food Packaging
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/27/2018) |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-03-16 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7732.pdf |