RI H7731 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Creating A Legislative Study Commission On Climate Change Impacts And Solutions (creates A 17 Member Commission To Study The Issues Confronting The State Due To Climate Change, And Who Would Report Back To The House By May 14, 2025, And Expire On June 18, 2025.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOUSE RESOLUTION CREATING A LEGISLATIVE STUDY COMMISSION ON CLIMATE CHANGE IMPACTS AND SOLUTIONS (Creates a 17 member commission to study the issues confronting the State due to climate change, and who would report back to the House by May 14, 2025, and expire on June 18, 2025.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-11 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-11HouseHouse passed Sub A
2024-06-10HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/11/2024)
2024-06-10HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2024-06-07HouseProposed Substitute
2024-06-07HouseScheduled for consideration (06/10/2024)
2024-03-21HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2024-03-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024)
2024-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback