RI H7727 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Create a tariff-based renewable energy distributed generation financing program.
Title
The Distributed Generation Growth Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Distributed gen. growth program approval of amendment lc 004759/2 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-11 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-05 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2014) |
2014-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |