RI H7723 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts certain prepackaged manufacturer-supplied steroids and hormones from the pharmaceutical dosage limits contained in the uniform controlled substance act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Uniform Controlled Substances Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-14SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-08SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2018-06-05HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/05/2018)
2018-05-30HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/30/2018)
2018-04-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-03-16HouseCommittee transferred to House H.E.W.
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback