RI H7716 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifies that the use of a wireless communication device for the purpose of navigation must be while the device is mounted or otherwise affixed to the vehicle and not held in the motorist’s hand.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Miscellaneous Rules

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-19 - House - Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-20SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2022-05-19HouseHouse passed Sub A
2022-05-13HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/19/2022)
2022-05-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2022-05-06HouseProposed Substitute
2022-05-06HouseScheduled for reconsideration (05/12/2022)
2022-04-13HouseCommittee recommends passage
2022-04-08HouseScheduled for consideration (04/13/2022)
2022-03-17HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2022-03-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2022)
2022-03-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback