RI H7715 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new criminal offense for the delivery of a controlled substance resulting in death.
Title
Homicide
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment (Y: 14 N: 56 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-06-14 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment (Y: 20 N: 49 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-06-14 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment (Y: 14 N: 56 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-06-14 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment (Y: 20 N: 49 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-06-14 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2018) |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2018) |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |