RI H7703 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a retail storeowner or their agent to use reasonable force to defend the persons and property of the retail establishment. The owner or their agent could use deadly force to respond to a crime of violence.
Title
Burglary And Breaking And Entering
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Cardillo [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7703.pdf |