RI H7699 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING AND CONSERVATION TRUST FUND ACT - Restructures RI Housing and Conservation Trust Fund, increase its membership to 15 members, 11 of whom are to be from the general public and reallocate the percentage of the funds for housing, conservation and other goals.
Title
Restructures RI Housing and Conservation Trust Fund, increase its membership to 15 members, 11 of whom are to be from the general public and reallocate the percentage of the funds for housing, conservation and other goals.
Sponsors
Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Megan Cotter [D] | Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] |
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-02-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING AND CONSERVATION TRUST FUND ACT
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RHODE ISLAND HOUSING AND CONSERVATION TRUST FUND ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7699.pdf |