RI H7699 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes possession of a catalytic converter by any person, other than a salvage yard, muffler shop or automobile or truck repair shop, presumptive evidence that the converter was stolen.
Title
Theft, Embezzlement, False Pretenses, And Misappropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7699.pdf |