RI H7697 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines hate crimes, provide that proof of one’s membership in a protected group in and of itself is not sufficient to prove hate or animus and make the hate crime sentencing enhancement applicable to petty misdemeanors.
Title
Sentence And Execution
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. David Morales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7697.pdf |