RI H7697 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that the state medical examiner is to conduct a multi-disciplinary team review of drug-related overdose deaths.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office Of Medical Examiners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-26HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22HouseCommittee transferred to House H.E.W.
2018-06-22HouseHouse voted to recommit to House Judiciary
2018-06-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-21HouseScheduled for consideration (06/21/2018)
2018-06-21HouseCommittee transferred to House Judiciary
2018-04-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback