RI H7690 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that upon issuance of a citation, the judgment debtor is given twenty-five (25) days to contact the judgment creditor to resolve the matter prior to court intervention.
Title
Proceedings In Aid Of Execution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2022) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-04-12 | House | House read and passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/12/2022) |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |