RI H7689 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes any acquittal or dismissal of any offense eligible for sealing under chapter 1 of title 12, lowers the time limitations for certain expungements and amends the eligibility requirements for certain expungements.
Title
Identification And Apprehension Of Criminals
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7689.pdf |