RI H7686 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an exception to required school immunizations for pupils whose personal, philosophical, or religious beliefs are contrary to immunization and/or testing.
Title
Offenses Pertaining To Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018) |
2018-03-20 | House | Meeting postponed (03/21/2018) |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7686.pdf |