RI H7683 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House voted to recommit to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals several sections of the general laws regarding the packaging and branding of pickled fish.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pickled Fish

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseHouse voted to recommit to House H.E.W.
2018-04-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/26/2018)
2018-03-27HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-03-20HouseMeeting postponed (03/21/2018)
2018-03-20HouseScheduled for consideration
2018-03-14HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018)
2018-03-06HouseMeeting postponed (03/07/2018)
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback