RI H7678 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Unlawful Sexual Harassment In The Workplace (creates An Eleven (11) Member Special Legislative Commission To Study Unlawful Sexual Harassment In The Workplace And Reports Back To The House Of Representatives No Later Than May 17, 2018 And Whose Life Would Expire On June 7, 2018.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Unlawful Sexual Harassment In The Workplace (creates An Eleven (11) Member Special Legislative Commission To Study Unlawful Sexual Harassment In The Workplace And Reports Back To The House Of Representatives No Later Than May 17, 2018 And Whose Life Would Expire On June 7, 2018.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseHouse read and passed
2018-03-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/20/2018)
2018-03-15HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-09HouseScheduled for consideration (03/15/2018)
2018-03-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback