RI H7677 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Student Journalists' Freedom of Expression Act protecting student journalists' right to exercise freedom of speech in school-sponsored media.
Title
Student Journalists' Freedom Of Expression Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2016) |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7677.pdf |