RI H7676 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Relating To Open Space And Forest Conservation -- Capital Development Program (provides For Voter Referendum Seeking Approval Of Issuance Of Bonds Not To Exceed $4,000,000 And For The State Local Land Acquisition Matching Grant Program For Open Space And Land Conservation.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Relating To Open Space And Forest Conservation -- Capital Development Program (provides For Voter Referendum Seeking Approval Of Issuance Of Bonds Not To Exceed $4,000,000 And For The State Local Land Acquisition Matching Grant Program For Open Space And Land Conservation.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2020-07-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/29/2020)
2020-02-26HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback