RI H7673 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Renames the state airport in Warwick to "Rhode Island International Airport" and would rename the building known as the "Interlink" to the "Theodore Francis Green Interlink."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

T.f. Green Airport

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 22 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-05-19HouseMeeting postponed (05/23/2018)
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration
2018-04-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback