RI H7670 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides 6% base rate increase for Medicaid home care for skilled nursing/therapeutic/nurse assistants/homemakers; 40% increase for Medicaid home care/hospice providers with annual inflation increase effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Long-term Care Service And Finance Reform
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018) |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7670.pdf |