RI H7661 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the public utilities commission to periodically review the advertising expense, passed through in utility rates, to determine whether the expense should be deemed allowable or should be excluded from the utility's rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Duties Of Utilities And Carriers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-04-06HouseCommittee transferred to House Corporations
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback