RI H7651 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer the regulatory and administrative duties for Mixed Martial Arts and Boxing and Wrestling from the Division of Racing and Athletics to the Department of Business Regulation.
Title
Boxing And Wrestling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-12 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2014) |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-03 | House | House read and passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/03/2014) |
2014-04-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/01/2014) |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |