RI H7645 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Camille F. Vella-Wilkinson to join Michele Ann Small and Scott David Small in marriage on or about March 1, 2020, within the City of Warwick, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-02-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |
2020-02-25 | House | House read and passed |