RI H7642 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals sections of the general laws dealing with grading of various qualities of mackerel and the sale or export of pickled fish not approved or branded
Title
Pickled Fish
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018) |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7642.pdf |