RI H7641 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Senate passed as amended in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the sale of dogs under 8 weeks of age unless approval for sale in writing from a licensed Rhode Island veterinarian with violations subject to imprisonment not to exceed 12 months or $1,000, or both. Pounds and shelters are exempt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dogs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed as amended in concurrence
2018-06-21SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-13SenateCommittee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
2018-06-08SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2018)
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
2018-05-31HouseHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/31/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-03-20HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018)
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback