RI H7637 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows a provisional employee in classified service, who has satisfactorily served in their position for more than five (5) consecutive years, to be deemed qualified to be awarded permanent status in that position, without the need of examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Merit System

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
2018-03-01HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (03/01/2018)
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback