RI H7635 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a seasonal employment designation for purposes of unemployment insurance which would allow employers hiring employees 20 weeks training/prevent seasonal employers from collecting unemployment benefits during the term of their seasonal employment.
Title
Seasonal Employment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018) |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7635.pdf |