RI H7632 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- ASSAULTS - Permits assaulted healthcare employee to have option of having home address, place of employment, voter roll information and any information related to any labor organization, impounded from public records.
Title
Permits assaulted healthcare employee to have option of having home address, place of employment, voter roll information and any information related to any labor organization, impounded from public records.
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] | Rep. Jon Brien [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7632.pdf |