RI H7632 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount from eighteen thousand dollars ($18,000) to twenty-five thousand dollars ($25,000) that retired state educators could earn in yearly compensation in their post-retirement, before their retirement benefits would be reduced.
Title
Post-retirement Employment
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7632.pdf |