RI H7631 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires every individual or group health insurance contract effective on or after January 1, 2023, to provide coverage to the insured and the insured's spouse and dependents for all FDA-approved contraceptive drugs, devices and other products.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7631.pdf |