RI H7628 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the executive office of health and human services to increase Medicaid rates for the Early Intervention and First Connections programs allowing for payment of competitive wages for qualified professionals.
Title
Maternal And Child Health Services For Children With Special Health Care Needs
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7628.pdf |