RI H7624 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates minimum staffing levels/standards for quality care for nursing homes with penalties for violations/grants for enhanced training/wages adjusted for inflation.
Title
Nursing Home Staffing And Quality Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-07-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/08/2020) |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7624.pdf |