RI H7620 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the non-Keno lottery prize awards from a maximum of sixty-five percent (65%) to seventy-one percent (71%) of the total revenue accruing from the sale of lottery tickets.
Title
State Lottery
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7620.pdf |