RI H7616 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- RENEWABLE READY PROGRAM - Establishes the renewable ready program and fund to promotes the responsible siting/development of renewable energy generating resources in locations where it would be an ancillary beneficial use to the redevelopment of previously contaminated property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the renewable ready program and fund to promotes the responsible siting/development of renewable energy generating resources in locations where it would be an ancillary beneficial use to the redevelopment of previously contaminated property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-25HouseSigned by Governor
2024-06-21HouseTransmitted to Governor
2024-06-13SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2024-06-12SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2024)
2024-06-12HouseHouse passed Sub A
2024-06-11HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/12/2024)
2024-06-10HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2024-06-07HouseProposed Substitute
2024-06-07HouseScheduled for consideration (06/10/2024)
2024-03-21HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2024-03-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024)
2024-03-14HouseCommittee transferred to House Corporations
2024-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback