RI H7606 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that all school districts shall incorporate cursive handwriting into elementary school curriculum in order to be proficient by third grade.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7606.pdf |