RI H7605 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that public engineers and individuals utilizing equipment and performing volunteer services on land trust, conservation, or the individuals' personal property be exempt from the provisions of law relating to licensing of hoisting engineers.
Title
Hoisting Engineers
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] |
Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7605.pdf |