RI H7604 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a consumer report agency may not charge a consumer a fee for any security freeze service. Effective September 1, 2018.
Title
Consumer Empowerment And Identity Prevention Act Of 2006
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2018) |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-04-10 | House | House read and passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/10/2018) |
2018-04-03 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018) |
2018-03-12 | House | Meeting postponed (03/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |